McClellan v. Kern County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Gregory McClellan
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff's Office, John Marshall, T. Gonzales, M. Cutillo, S. Roberson, Donny Youngblood, W. Hakker and W. Smallwood
Case Number: 1:2010cv00386
Filed: March 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER denying 162 Motion for Reconsideration of order denying extension of time to pay filing fee signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/16/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER DISMISSING Action for Plaintiff's Failure to Pay Filing Fee; Clerk to Terminate Motions and CLOSE CASE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/4/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Pay Filing Fee within Fourteen Days signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 09/09/2017. (Flores, E)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER DENYING 128 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP and ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Pay the $400.00 Filing Fee Within Fourteen (14) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/15/2016. (Jessen, A)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 112 Motion for Leave to Serve Additional Interrogatories on Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 09/28/2015. (Flores, E)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER ADOPTING In Part and Declining to Adopt in Part 97 Findings and Recommendations and Granting 83 Motion to Revoke IFP Status signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 09/28/2015. (Flores, E)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 101 Motion for Sanctions, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/31/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS To Deny Plaintiff's Motion To Amend The Pleadings (ECF No. 88 & 100 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/13/2015. (Fahrney, E)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING In Part and DENYING In Part Defendants' 89 Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/27/2015. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Plaintiff's 88 Motion to Amend the Pleadings signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 07/13/2015. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 7/31/2015.(Flores, E)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending to Deny Defendants' 83 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's IFP Status signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 07/10/2015. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 7/27/2015.(Flores, E)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 77 Request to Extend Discovery Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/20/15. (Verduzco, M)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/11/2014 recommending to: (1) GRANT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RULING 51 ; (2) DENY PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COURT CERTIFICATION 41 ; (3) DENY PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY COURT PROCEEDINGS 54 AND DISMISS ACTION FOR FAILURE TO OBEY A COURT ORDER AND FAILURE TO PROSECUTE 53 . Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 12/29/2014.(Lundstrom, T)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Denying 49 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/07/2014. (Flores, E)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying Motion For Ruling (ECF No. 36 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/25/2014. (Fahrney, E)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Denying 28 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations; ORDER Denying as Moot 30 Request that Clerk File Objections to Findings and Recommendations signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/06/2014. (Flores, E)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Finding that Plaintiff States a Cognizable Fourth Amendment Claim and Dismissing other Claims and Defendants for Failure to State a Claim re 21 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 06/02/14. Objections Due Within Fourteen Days. Referred to Judge O'Neill. (Gonzalez, R)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Finding that Plaintiff States a Cognizable Fourth Amendment Claim and Dismissing other claims and Defendants for Failure to State a Claim; Objections Due within Fourteen Days signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/27/2013. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 10/17/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClellan v. Kern County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Cutillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Hakker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?