Miller v. Brown, et al.

Plaintiff: Michael Anthony Miller
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, A. Schwarzenegger and Z. Morazzini
Case Number: 1:2010cv00453
Filed: March 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Denying 48 Motion for Reconsideration and Reinstatement of Complaint, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/11/2012. (Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration or to reinstate his complaint is DENIED; No further filings will be accepted in this case.) (Gaumnitz, R)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Remand the Matter to the Fresno County Superior Court; ORDER DENYING 43 Motion for a Hearing as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/30/2011. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 10/17/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunctive Relief 23 , 24 , 36 ; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Resolution of Request for Injunctive Relief 35 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/15/11.(Verduzco, M)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/10/2011 adopting 16 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 10 Motion to remand.(Lundstrom, T)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/30/2010 recommending that 10 MOTION To Remand be DENIED. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 10/19/2009.(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Brown, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Anthony Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown
Represented By: Christopher James Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Schwarzenegger
Represented By: Christopher James Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z. Morazzini
Represented By: Christopher James Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?