Gonzalez-Cervantes v. Napolitano, et al
Petitioner: Jose Crisanto Gonzalez-Cervantes
Respondent: Edmund G. Brown, Jr. and Janet Napolitano
Case Number: 1:2010cv00510
Filed: March 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 12 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis On Appeal; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Serve a Copy of the Order With the Court of Appeals, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/7/2011. (Marrujo, C)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus For Failing to State A Cognizable Claim; Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment; and The Court DECLINES to issue a certificate of appealability, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/19/2010. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Report Current Address signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/15/2010. Failure to follow this order may result in dismissal of the petition without prejudice pursuant to Local Rules 110 and 183(b). Notice of Current Address due by 11/17/2010. (Bradley, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez-Cervantes v. Napolitano, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Crisanto Gonzalez-Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?