First Bank v. American Contractors Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: First Bank
Defendant: American Contractors Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv00548
Filed: March 29, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to DISMISS and CLOSE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/26/2010. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FURTHER STIPULATION and ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANT MOTION TO DISMISS currently set for 6/10/2010 has been CONTINUED to 8/12/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 2, 2010. (Lira, I)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/16/2010. The hearing re Motion to Dismiss 6 now set for 7/1/2010 is continued to 7/22/2010 at 8:30 AM in Ctrm. 4 before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Arellano, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Bank v. American Contractors Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Bank
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Kirschenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Contractors Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?