Aubert v. Hector
Plaintiff: Ess'nn A. Aubert
Defendant: Hector Robles
Case Number: 1:2010cv00565
Filed: April 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Denying 75 Motion for New Trial, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/30/14. (Verduzco, M)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT: Ess'nn A. Aubert, CDC# V-77688 on May 29, 2014 at 8 a.m. in Courtroom #6, 7th Floor, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/9/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting Defendant's Request To Modify The Pretrial Order And Extend The Deadline To Submit Trial Exhibits (ECF No. 54 ), Trial Exhibits Due May 12, 2014, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/11/2014. (Trial Exhibits Deadline: 5/12/2014) (Fahrney, E)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 AMENDED SECOND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 02/10/2014. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 4/3/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng; Jury Trial set for 5/28/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Flores, E)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Requiring Parties to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference Would be Beneficial, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/20/2013. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING 37 Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/19/2013. (Marrujo, C)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATION Re Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment (ECF No. 26 ), Objections Due In Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/14/2013. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 12/19/2013.(Fahrney, E)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Directing Clerk to Move Document 32 from this Case into Case 1:07-cv-1629 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/30/2012. (Flores, E)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting Defendant's 34 Motion; ORDER Permitting Plaintiff Opportunity to Withdraw Opposition and File Amended Opposition, if he so Wishes signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/26/2012. Amended Opposition due by 8/20/2012. (Flores, E)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/5/2011 granting 23 Motion for leave to depose Plaintiff by Videoconference.(Lundstrom, T)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 19 Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Robles, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/6/2011. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aubert v. Hector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ess'nn A. Aubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?