Maverick Asphalt, Inc. v. Windsor Fuel Company et al
Plaintiff: Maverick Asphalt, Inc.
Defendant: Windsor Fuel Company, Windsor Fuel Co., Inc., Continental Western Transportation Company, Inc., Michael S. Telfer, - Continental Casualty Company and Western Surety Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv00569
Filed: April 1, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 32 Stipulation requestion extension of time to file dispositional documents signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on August 31, 2010. The deadline for filing dispositional documents is extended from August 27, 2010, to September 10, 2010.(Timken, A)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 29 Stipulation and Request for Extension of Time to File Dispositional Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/17/2010. The Filing of dispositional documents shall be done no later than 8/27/2010. (Timken, A)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER continuing the hearing on Plaintiff's motion to remand case to state court and continuance of the scheduling conference. The Hearing re Motion to Remand currently set for 7/2/2010 is CONTINUED to 8/6/2010 at 09:30 A M in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 7/28/2010 is CONTINUED to 9/2/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/25/2010. (Timken, A)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER continuing the Hearing re Motion to Remand currently set for 6/4/2010 to 7/2/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, and the Scheduling Conference currently set for 6/28/2010 to 7/28/2010 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/1/2010. (Timken, A)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DIRECTING the parties to submit a brief, not to exceed to 10 pages, addressing the matters the Court has outlined in said order; case management deadline set for 5/28/2010 for receipt of same; order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/24/2010. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maverick Asphalt, Inc. v. Windsor Fuel Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maverick Asphalt, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Gordon Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Fuel Company
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Fuel Co., Inc.
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Western Transportation Company, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Telfer
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?