Smith v. Hubbard et al
Plaintiff: Ed Dwayne Smith
Defendant: Susan L Hubbard, J. Jones, Hicinbonton, F. Fields and E. Felix
Case Number: 1:2010cv00576
Filed: April 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER STRIKING Unsigned 19 Objection, and Granting Plaintiff Thirty Days Within Which to File a Signed Objection, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/30/2012. (Signed Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days.) (Marrujo, C)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Action For Failure to State a Claim Under Section 1983, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/8/2012, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:10-cv-0134 JAM KJM PC) to Fresno (1:10-cv-0576 SMS PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/2/2010. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hubbard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Dwayne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan L Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hicinbonton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Felix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?