Moria Rogers v. Seibert Family Trust 1995, et al.
Plaintiff: Moria Rogers
Defendant: Leslie C Seibert, Marilyn J Seibert and Seibert Family Trust 1995
Case Number: 1:2010cv00589
Filed: April 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION and ORDER of DISMISSAL signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/19/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 97 Ex Parte Application to Consider Exhibits Filed Out of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/19/2012. (Gaumnitz, R)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE regarding ex parte contact with the court by witness. ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/18/2012. (Timken, A)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment (Doc. 48 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/22/2012. (Fahrney, E)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 59 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/23/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Sanction Defendant for Destruction of Evidence [Docs. 41 and 42]. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/11/2011. (Herman, H)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Dates and ORDER - the Discovery deadlines be continued to: Non Expert by 9/23/2011; Expert by 9/23/2011; and Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 9/23/2011. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/31/2011. (Herman, H)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to Reassign Action; New case number is: 1:10-cv-589 SMS, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/03/2010. (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moria Rogers v. Seibert Family Trust 1995, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moria Rogers
Represented By: Stuart E. Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie C Seibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn J Seibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seibert Family Trust 1995
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?