Shorter v. Rosenthal et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Shorter
Defendant: R. Rosenthal, CDCR, California State Prison, Corcoran, Derral G Adams, S. Brooks, G. Doan, S. Wortman, T. Lloren and Custody Staff
Case Number: 1:2010cv00610
Filed: April 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING 80 Motion to Quash the Balance of the Filing Fee, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/13/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING 76 Motion to Quash Filing Fee signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/20/2013. (Jessen, A)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 68 Motion for Confirmation of Court's Ruling as Moot; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 71 Motion to Expunge the Filing Fee, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/8/13. (Gonzalez, R)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting Parties' Stipulation To Waive Right To Appeal In Exchange For Waiver Of Right To Pursue Costs (Document 73 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/2/2013. (Fahrney, E)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Surreply 59 ; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment be Denied 39 and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted 49 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/24/13. Referred to Judge O'Neill; 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER APPROVING Parties' Stipulation 43 to Modify Deadlines; ORDERED that the Deadline for Defendants to file their Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be Continued until the Dispositive Motion Deadline of January 11, 2013, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/31/12. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 35 Motion for Modification of Discovery and Scheduling Order; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 36 Motion Regarding Defendant's Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/9/12. Discovery due by 11/30/2012; Dispositive Motions filed by 1/11/2013. (Gonzalez, R)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Second Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (# 37 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/4/2012. (Fahrney, E)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Denying 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/10/12. (Verduzco, M)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING 29 Plaintiff's Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/8/2012. (Jessen, A)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion Return Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Amended Exhibit by Mail, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 03/22/2011. (Documents 8 and 9 mailed to Plaintiff) (Martin, S)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING 9 Motion to Amend the Complaint; Response Due within 30 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/8/2011. Second Amended Complaint or Notification due by 3/14/2011. (Sant Agata, S) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2011: # 1 Amended Complaint Form) (Sant Agata, S).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shorter v. Rosenthal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Shorter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Prison, Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derral G Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Wortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Lloren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custody Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?