Louis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Alexander K. Louis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2010cv00656
Filed: March 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CORRECTED ORDER Granting Motion for Attorneys' Fees Under 28 U.S.C. 2412 (D) 32 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/10/12. (Gonzalez, R)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING 27 Motion for Attorneys' Fees Under 28 U.S.C. 2412(D), signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/21/2011. This Court AWARDS to Plaintiff attorneys' fees under the EAJA of $6511.17 attributable to the work of Plaintiff's attorney and $530.00 attributable to Plaintiff's paralegal, for a total fee award of $7041.17. (Marrujo, C)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment 21 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/11/2011. (Herman, H)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REVERSING Agency Determination and REMANDING for Payment of Benefits signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/11/2011. CASE CLOSED.(Sant Agata, S)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER: Plaintiff shall have a second extension to 3/2/2011, to file Opening Brief. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/17/2011. (Herman, H)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER: extension for Plaintiff's Opening Brief by 2/23/2011. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/24/2011. (Herman, H)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/14/2010. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander K. Louis
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?