Cozad Trailer Sales, LLC v. Pacific Coast Trailers, LLC et al.
Plaintiff: Cozad Trailer Sales, LLC
Defendant: Pacific Coast Trailers, LLC, Reliance Trailer Manufacturing, Reliance Trailer Co., LLC, Redwood Reliance Sales Company, Brian Ling, Donald K. Ling and Joseph Mayo
Case Number: 1:2010cv00668
Filed: April 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS: Joseph Mayo and Pacific Coast Trailers, LLC WITH PREJUDICE; ORDERED that the Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement and Release Agreement, if necessary; ORDERED that all Defendants are now DISMISSED from this action, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/1/2010. CASE CLOSED(Martin, S)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS Reliance Trailer Manufacturing, Reliance Trailer Co., LLC, Redwood Reliance Sales Company, Brian Ling, and Donald K. Ling, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/15/2010. (Jessen, A)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER vacating hearing date of June 28, 2010 and taking matter under submission signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/24/2010. (Nazaroff, H)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER on 43 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or for Change of Venue, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/15/2010. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cozad Trailer Sales, LLC v. Pacific Coast Trailers, LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cozad Trailer Sales, LLC
Represented By: Sherrie Marie Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Coast Trailers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Trailer Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Trailer Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redwood Reliance Sales Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Ling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald K. Ling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?