Wallen v. Tahoe Joe's, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Theresa Wallen
Defendant: Tahoe Joe's, Inc., Vietty Enterprises, Ltd. and Erma Ruth Vietty
Case Number: 1:2010cv00676
Filed: April 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/10/2011. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER TO EXTEND Deadline to Dismiss Action re 42 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/1/2011. Dismissal Papers due by 2/10/2011. (Jessen, A)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER after settlement signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/5/2011. (The Court VACATES all pending dates and matters.)(Figueroa, O)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request to continue the Settlement Conference currently set for 11/17/2010 and CONTINUING it to 1/6/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin; order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/16/2010. (Rooney, M)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Settlement Conference currently set for 11/8/2010 to 11/17/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/5/2010. (Kusamura, W)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Vietty Enterprises, Ltd., signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/29/2010. (Jessen, A)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 11 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/10/2010. This Court DISMISSES this Action against Ms. Vietty Only. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallen v. Tahoe Joe's, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Wallen
Represented By: Tanya Eugene Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tahoe Joe's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vietty Enterprises, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erma Ruth Vietty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?