Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority v. US Dept. of Interior, et al
Plaintiff: Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Bureau of Reclamation, Michael L. Connor and Donald R. Glaser
Intervenor_defendant: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority and Westlands Water District
Case Number: 1:2010cv00712
Filed: February 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 FINAL JUDGMENT, signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/6/2011. CASE CLOSED(Kusamura, W)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING 98 Motion for Extension of Time to File Form of Judgment, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/10/2011. (Kusamura, W)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM, DECISION on Cross Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment 52 60 62 and Motion to Strike 77 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/29/2011. (Kusamura, W) (No new information was added to this order, only cosmetic changes were made.) Modified on 8/2/2011 (Kusamura, W).
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM, DECISION on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment 52 60 62 , and Motion to Strike 77 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/29/2011. (Kusamura, W)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Granting Joint Motion For Extension of Time to File Disapprovals to Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/23/2011. (The Parties shall have until 7/12/2011 to file their Disapprovals.) (Gaumnitz, R)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION of the Parties and ORDER Regarding Page Limits For Memoranda of Law Related to Motions For Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/22/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION of the Parties and ORDER Setting Briefing and Hearing Schedule, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/25/2010. (Plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment and supporting memorandum on or before 12/1/2010, Defendants and Defen dant-Intervenors shall file cross-motions for summary judgment and memoranda supporting their motions and responding to Plaintiffs motion on or before 1/7/2011, Plaintiff shall file a reply memoranda in support of Plaintiffs motion and in opposition to Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors motions on or before 1/28/2011, Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors shall file reply memoranda in support of Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors motions on or before 2/18/2011, Cross Motions for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 3/18/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger.) (Gaumnitz, R)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Re: The San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority and Westlands Water District's Motion to Intervene 23 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/28/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Reassigning Related Case signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 04/19/2010. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority v. US Dept. of Interior, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tehama-Colusa Canal Authority
Represented By: James Mark Atlas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: David Gehlert, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lee Salazar
Represented By: David Gehlert, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: David Gehlert, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Connor
Represented By: David Gehlert, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald R. Glaser
Represented By: David Gehlert, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority
Represented By: Rebecca Rose Akroyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Westlands Water District
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?