Garcia v. Joaquin et al

Plaintiff: Vicente Garcia
Defendant: A. Joaquin, K.A. Lee, B. Grimm and Nelson Madrilejo
Case Number: 1:2010cv00730
Filed: April 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of Action 54 ; Clerk Shall Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/4/12. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that all 13 Claims Except Plaintiff's Inadequate Medical Care Claim be Dismissed with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 09/27/2011. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 10/31/2011. (Flores, E)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Adopting 28 Findings and Recommendations 28 and Denying Motions for Temporary Restraining Order 4 , 12 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/11/11. (Gonzalez, R)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Denying 29 Motion for Permissive Joinder, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/20/11. (Gonzalez, R)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denial, Without Prejudice, Of Plaintiff's Motions For Temporary Restraining Orders And Preliminary Injunctions (ECF Nos. 4 & 12 ), Objections Due Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/17/2011. F&R's referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 3/24/2011. (Fahrney, E)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING in Full 25 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING 14 Motion for Library Acces, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/10/2010. (Marrujo, C)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Library Access be Denied; Objections due in Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/7/2010. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 11/12/2010. (Bradley, A)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RETURNING Documents to Plaintiff re 21 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/1/2010. (Bradley, A)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/6/2010. (Sondheim, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Joaquin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicente Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Joaquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.A. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Grimm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Madrilejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?