United States of America v. Approximately $10,923.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $10,923.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 1:2010cv00787
Filed: May 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DEFAULT JUDGMENT and FINAL Judgment of Forfeiture, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/23/11. (Hellings, J)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING, in full, the Findings and Recommendations, document 27 , and FURTHER GRANTING the Motion for Default Judgment, document 25 ; plaintiff is DIRECTED to submit, within ten days of service of this order, a proposed default and final forfeiture judgment consistent with the Magistrate Judge's findings and recommendations; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/14/2011. (Rooney, M)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/14/2010. Objections to F&R due by 1/4/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/5/2010 regarding Clerk's Issuance of Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $10,923.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kristin S. Door
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $10,923.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?