All Points Capital Corporation v. Foster and Sons General Engineering Contractors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: All Points Capital Corporation
Defendant: Foster and Sons General Engineering Contractors, Inc., James B. Foster and Otilia T. Foster
Case Number: 1:2010cv00801
Filed: May 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS re 25 Second Request for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendants Foster and Sons General Engineering Contractors, Inc., James B. Foster and Otilia T. Foster signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/9/2011. Objections due within fifteen (15) days of service of this recommendation. (Bradley, A)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 22 Request for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendants Foster and Sons General Engineering Contractors, Inc., James B. Foster and Otilia T. Foster signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/23/2011. (Bradley, A)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER VACATING 16 Findings and Recommendations of December 12, 2010 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/16/2010. (Figueroa, O)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Defendant Foster and Sons General Engineering Contractors, Inc. signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/12/2010. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 12/27/2010. (Bradley, A)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing plaintiff to show cause, in writing, by 12/2/2010, re issues with the service of summons and complaint, and further ORDERING the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for hearing on 11/22/2010 before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin VACATED, and SETTING a Status Conference for 12/16/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin; order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/18/2010. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All Points Capital Corporation v. Foster and Sons General Engineering Contractors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster and Sons General Engineering Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otilia T. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Points Capital Corporation
Represented By: Dean P. Sperling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?