Parks v. State of California
Petitioner: Steven Dean Parks
Respondent: State of California
Case Number: 1:2010cv00829
Filed: May 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING and DISREGARDING as MOOT Petitioner's 15 Motion to Continue the Petition; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss the 1 Petition without Leave to Amend for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Petitioner's 20 Motion for Dismissal or Default Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/17/2011. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 6/20/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying Motion And Amended Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Documents 16 & 17 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/3/2010. (Fahrney, E)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's 9 Motion to Amend the Petition; ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to Change the Name of the Respondent to Kathleen Allison; ORDER to Petitioner to SHOW CAUSE in Thirty (30) Days Why the Petition Should Not be Dismissed for Petitioner's Failure to Exhaust State Remedies re 1 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/7/2010. Show Cause Response due by 10/12/2010. (Bradley, A)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner Leave to File A Motion to Amend the Petition and Name A Proper Respondent No Later Than Thirty (30) Day After the Date of Service of This Order; ORDER DENYING 3 Motion for Extension of Time; ORDER DENYING 6 Motion for Clarification, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/26/2010. (Filing Deadline: 8/30/2010.) (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks v. State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Dean Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?