Eugenio Pereida v. Hartley

Petitioner: Eugenio Pereida
Respondent: James D Hartley
Case Number: 1:2010cv00860
Filed: May 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS To Summarily Dismiss Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus For Lack Of Jurisdiction (Doc. 1 ), ORDER Directing That Objections Be Filed Within Twenty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/07/2012. F&R's referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 11/30/2012. (Fahrney, E)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE and ORDER to FILE RESPONSE signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/11/2012. Filing Deadline: 5/11/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING 15 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING 11 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER REMANDING Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus to Magistrate Judge for Further Proceedings, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/14/2010. (Marrujo, C)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Respondent's 11 Motion to Dismiss be Denied; ORDER DIRECTING Objections be Filed within Twenty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/3/2010. Referred to Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Objections to F&R due by 11/29/2010. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eugenio Pereida v. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eugenio Pereida
Represented By: Brandie Grover Devall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James D Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?