Ford v. Wildey et al
Plaintiff: Benny Ford
Defendant: G. Wildey, R. Marshall and L. Bonifascio
Case Number: 1:2010cv01024
Filed: June 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION dated *2/10/2016*. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Regarding Parties' Motions In Limine (ECF Nos. 150 , 151 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/26/2016. (Fahrney, E)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Benny Ford, CDCR #C-04844, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/11/16. Jury Trial set for 2/9/2016 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Verduzco, M)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motions to Add Witnesses to Be Present at Trial on February 9, 2016 155 , 156 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/5/16: Motions are DENIED. (Hellings, J)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Denying 153 Plaintiff's Motion for Court to Order Independent Wrist Examination, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/28/18. (Gonzalez, R)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/18/2015.(Response: 1/15/2016, Filing: 12/18/2015, Motion In Limine Hearing set for 1/26/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, Trial set for 2/9/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone ) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 137 Motion for Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses, DENYING Plaintiff's 143 Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas, and GRANTING Defendants' Request for Exclusion of Witnesses From Courtroom During Trial, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/3/15. (Marrujo, C)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order Allowing his Attendance at Trial, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/13/15. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/26/2015. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 12/18/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Telephonic Motions In Limine Hearing set for 1/26/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Jury Trial set for 2/9/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Lundstrom, T)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER setting telephonic conference call signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/17/2015. (Telephonic Conference set for 8/26/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone).(Lundstrom, T)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER assigning action to Magistrate Judge signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/13/2015. The new case number is 1:10-cv-01024-SAB-(PC).(Lundstrom, T)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION, DENYING Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 63 , 95 , 102 , 103 , 115 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/23/15. (Hellings, J)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER REGARDING Plaintiff's 121 Motion for Clarification, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/18/2015. (Marrujo, C)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Compel And Motion For Sanctions (ECF No. 116 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/6/2015. (Fahrney, E)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 63 , 95 , 102 ,103]), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/13/2015. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 5/18/2015. (Fahrney, E)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Denying, without Prejudice, Plaintiff's 113 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/08/2015. (Flores, E)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' Request for a Protective Order 107 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/23/15: 20-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to File UNDER SEAL Defendants' Confidential Document and Request for Leave to File Confidential Records Under Seal for in Camera Review, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/19/15. (Hellings, J)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Directing Defendant Wildey To Submit Confidential Document Referenced In Defendant's October 27, 2014, Amended Response To Court Order, ECF No. 62 (ECF No. 92 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/11/2015.(Filing Deadline: 3/23/2015.) (Fahrney, E)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 66 , within ten (10) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/4/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 72 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/7/14. (Hellings, J)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Regarding 52 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/2/2014. Defendant Wildey shall file a supplemental response to document number one within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING In Part 45 Motion to Compel as to Interrogatory Number 25 as to Defendant Wildey and Interrogatory Number 22 as to Defendant Marshall and DENYING In Part 45 Motion to Compel in all other respects, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/6/14. (Martin-Gill, S) (30-Day Deadline)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 47 Request for Judicial Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/19/2014. (Marrujo, C)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying as moot 42 Motion for copies of discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/16/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying, Without Prejudice, Plaintiff's Motion For Independent Expert (ECF No. 40 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/5/2014. (Fahrney, E)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/22/2014 extending Discovery and Scheduling Order deadlines set forth 27 Order to Defendant, R. Marshall. (Lundstrom, T)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request For Entry Of Default (ECF No. 31 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/17/2014. (Fahrney, E)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Status Of Service As To Defendant R. Marshall (ECF No. 28 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/26/2013. (Fahrney, E)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re 8 Status Report signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 12/30/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Wildey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Wildey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Bonifascio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?