Pac-West Telecomm, Inn v. Verizon Business Global, LLC
Plaintiff: Pac-West Telecomm, Inc.
Defendant: Verizon Business Global, LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv01051
Filed: June 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/9/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/15/2012. This case will be stayed until the Federal Communications Commission issues orders addressing the petitions for declaratory ruling; Parties are to submit their next Joint Status Report within 30 days after the FCC issues the orders, or by September 10, 2012, if the FCC has not acted by that date. (Marrujo, C)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER - Requirement for Mandatory Scheduling Conference with Judge McAuliffe - see attached. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/10/2011. (Herman, H)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Extending Stay and Setting Deadline for Further Status Report, signed by District Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/16/2011. (Kusamura, W)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Courtroom Decorum. (Gaumnitz, R)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER on PAC-WEST'S 32 Motion for Primary Jurisdiction Referral and Stay pending FCC ruling, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 4/8/2011. (Kusamura, W)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM, DECISION and ORDER regarding Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Primary Jurisdiction Referral and Stay Pending FCC Ruling, Case Stayed for six months, including the entire case schedule and trial date; Parties shall submit a status report within 120 days, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 03/22/2011. (Martin, S)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CORRECTED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/14/2011. (Kusamura, W)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/8/2010. Mid-Discovery Status Reports Due: 2/14/2011; Discovery Cut-off: 4/11/2011; Non-Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: 7/20/2011; Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: 8 /1/2011; Settlement Conference set for 7/5/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin; Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger; Court Trial (3 days) set for 12/13/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Verduzco, M)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER To Dismiss Defendant (Doc. 18 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/28/2010. This Court DISMISSES this action as to defendant Verizon Business Global LLC only.(Scrivner, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pac-West Telecomm, Inn v. Verizon Business Global, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pac-West Telecomm, Inc.
Represented By: David G Bayles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Business Global, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?