McDaniel v. Chavez et al
Plaintiff: Robert McDaniel
Defendant: Frank X Chavez, T.N. Davis, K. Loyd, Overstreet, Cunningham, R. Cipriani, I.D. Clay, Matthew Cate, N. Grannis and R. Manual
Case Number: 1:2010cv01077
Filed: June 15, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That This Case be Dismissed, Without Prejudice, Because of Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Comply With a Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/7/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Converting Motion to Dismiss 58 to Motion for Summary Judgment, DENYING Plaintiff's Oral Request for Counsel and DIRECTING Clerk to Send Plaintiff a Copy of Motion to Dismiss 58 ; NOTICE and WARNING of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/25/2018. (Hellings, J)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 58 , 67 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/6/17: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant In Part and Deny In Part Defendants' 58 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/12/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/2/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Request for Office of the Attorney General to Provide Last Known Address for Defendants: Frank X. Chavez and T.N. Davis and ORDER,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/30/17. (Case Management Deadline: 21-Day Deadline)(Monica Anderson at AG electronicly served this order) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING 47 Motion to Appoint Counsel Pro Bono Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/9/17. (Marrujo, C)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's 43 Objections to Findings and Recommendations, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/4/16. (Gonzalez, R)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING 40 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS;ORDER for this action to proceed only against Defendants: Davis, Chavez and Lloyd for violation of due process and Dismissing all other claims and defendants; this case is referred back to the Magistr ate Judge for furthere proceedings, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/26/2016. I.D. Clay (Warden-Retired), Cunningham, N. Grannis (Appeals chief-Retired), R. Manual, Overstreet, Matthew Cate (Secretary) and R. Cipriani terminated. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this Action Proceed Only Against Defendants Chavez, Davis and Loyd for Violation of Due Process and That All Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed from this Action re 39 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/7/16. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING Motion to Expedite Case 26 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/14/15. (Hellings, J)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/26/2014. (Jessen, A)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying 22 Request for Judicial Notice signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 09/19/2014. (Flores, E)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 18 Motion to Amend the Complaint: ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to File 19 Second Amended Complaint Lodged on September 10, 2014, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 09/13/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Vacating 13 Findings and Recommendations of May 23, 2014, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/18/14. Thirty-Day Deadline for Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. (Gonzalez, R)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Case for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/23/14. Referred to Judge O'Neill; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. Chavez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank X Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Cipriani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.D. Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Manual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?