Mayfield v. Mix et al
Plaintiff: Dwayne Mayfield
Defendant: M. Mix and E. Mason
Case Number: 1:2010cv01091
Filed: June 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/9/2014 recommending Dismissal re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 5/30/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Notice To Plaintiff Regarding Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment; ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/14/2014. (Replies due by 3/11/2014) (Fahrney, E)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER OPENING LIMITED DISCOVERY AND SETTING REMAINING SCHEDULE signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/7/2013. Unenumerated Rule 12(b) Motions: September 15, 2013; Deadline to Amend Pleadings: October 1, 2013; Discovery Cut-Off: October 15, 2013; Dispositive Motion Deadline: December 30, 2013. (Lundstrom, T)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING 61 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and ORDER VACATING 60 Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/31/2013. The matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for the issuance of a new discovery and scheduling order. (Jessen, A)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER VACATING 9 October 22, 2010, Screening Order; ORDER VACATING 14 January 12, 2011, Order Dismissing Defendant Mason; ORDER VACATING July 26, 2011, Discovery and Scheduling Order and Subsequent Modifications (Docs. 25 , 38 and 40 ); ORDER DENYING 41 Defendant Mix's Motion for Summary Judgment Without Prejudice; and ORDER DENYING 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery Extension Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/8/2013. (Jessen, A)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 34 36 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline; Revised Discovery Deadline: August 15, 2012; ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 37 Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline; Revised Dispositive Motion Deadline: September 1, 2012 signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 6/5/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 34 Plaintiff's Motion to Postpone Deposition signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 4/17/2012. (Jessen, A)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Denying 31 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 3/19/12. (Verduzco, M)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be DISMISSED with prejudice, based on Plaintiff's failure to obey the Court's order of January 14, 2011; re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Dwayne Mayfield ; referred to Judge Wanger, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 03/11/2011. Objections to F&R due by 3/29/2011 (Martin, S)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants, and Referring Matter Back to Magistrate Judge to Initiate Service of Process; ORDER STRIKING 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Action be Dismissed With Prejudice, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/11/2011. Defendant E. Mason DISMISSED based on Plaintiff s failure to state any claims against him. (Marrujo, C)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE based on Plaintiff's failure to obey the Court's order of October 22, 2010; re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Dwayne Mayfield;referred to Judge Wanger,signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 12/14/2010. Objections to F&R due by 1/3/2011 (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayfield v. Mix et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Mix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?