Lanier v. City of Fresno et al
Plaintiff: Khalid Lanier
Defendant: Alfonso Castillo, Stephen Taylor, County of Fresno and City Of Fresno
Case Number: 1:2010cv01120
Filed: June 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Complaint be Dismissed. Matter referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days of service of this recommendation; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/27/2012. (Timken, A)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Court ORDERS plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, within 21 days of the issuance of this order, explaining why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Court's orders. The Court further ORDERS the Scheduling Conference currently set for 3/6/2012 VACATED. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/29/2012. (Rooney, M)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER CONTINUING the Scheduling Conference currently set for 1/24/2012, to 3/6/2012, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, and requiring Plaintiff to contact Defendant's counsel to meet and confer regarding the joint scheduling report and to provide contact information. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/18/2012. (Timken, A)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DENYING without prejudice 58 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of record for Plaintiff. The November 2, 2011, hearing scheduled on this motion is VACATED, the parties do not need to appear. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/26/2011. (Timken, A)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and ORDER amending the scheduling order. Non expert discovery due by no later than 11/30/2011. Expert disclosures due by no later than 11/30/2011. Supplemental expert disclosures due by no later than 12/15/2011. Expert discovery due b y no later than 12/30/2011. Non-dispositive motions to be filed by no later than 11/30/2011. Dispositive motions to be filed by no later than 1/16/2012. The Settlement Conference currently set for 10/27/2011 is RESET to 2/2/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/8/2011. (Timken, A)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER authorizing limited disclosure of confidential materials signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/10/2011. (Timken, A)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER on request for stipulated protective order. The parties shall refile a revised stipulation and proposed order for a protective order that complies with L.R. 141.1(c) and email a conforming copy of the stipulation and proposed order to skoorders @caed.uscourts.gov; and if, upon further consideration, the parties determine that there is no need for a Court order due to a private agreement between them, they shall withdraw their request for a protective order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/2/2011. (Timken, A)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT AND TO AMEND COMPLAINT 45 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 22, 2011. Motion Hearing currently set for March 28, 2011 is VACATED. (Lira, I)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ON RECONSIDERATION MOTION signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 18, 2011. (Lira, I)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER on Defendants' 24 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/8/2010. Stephen Taylor, City Of Fresno and County of Fresno terminated.(Sant Agata, S)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 15, 2010. (Lira, I)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON DEFENDANT FRESNO COUNTY'S F.R.Civ.P 12 MOTION TO DISMISS 16 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 8, 2010. Motion Hearing currently set for 10/14/2010 has been VACATED. (Lira, I)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER to extend Defendant County of Fresno's time to respond to or answer Plaintiff's complaint. Defendant COUNTY OF FRESNO shall have until September 16, 2010, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/8/2010. (Timken, A)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on September 1, 2010. Motion Hearing currently set for September 16, 2010 before Judge O'Neill is VACATED. Scheduling Conference currently set for 9/23/2010 has been CONTINUED to 12/2/2010 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Lira, I)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lanier v. City of Fresno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalid Lanier
Represented By: David M. Helbraun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfonso Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?