Jackson v. Palombo et al
Plaintiff: Richard Jackson
Defendant: Mike Palombo and R. Niino
Case Number: 1:2010cv01129
Filed: June 23, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel 86 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/11/13. (Verduzco, M)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting Motion to File Surreply 61 ; ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Dismissing Plaintiff's Excessive Force Claim as Barred by the Favorable Termination Rule re 54 , 58 , 62 , 67 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/15/13. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DENYING 71 Motion for Reconsideration, with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/21/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 73 and Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time 75 ; ORDER Vacating Discovery and Motion Deadlines and Staying Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/10/12. (Gonzalez, R)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Addressing 63 Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/10/12. (Gonzalez, R)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AMENDED SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - Notice and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/9/12. (Verduzco, M)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Denying 53 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Clarifying Deposition Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/27/12. (Gonzalez, R)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 51 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/15/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 43 Motion to Initiate Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 05/02/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING 41 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/13/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Amend Docket Entry to Reflect That Plaintiff's Filing of December 22, 2011, is His Oppostition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, and Granting Defendants Fifteen Days Within Which to File Their Reply, If any, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/3/12. (Gonzalez, R)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER STRIKING UNSIGNED FILING as to 27 Motion to Amend the Complaint and Requiring Plaintiff to File Response to Motion to Dismiss within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/30/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying 18 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/11/11. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Palombo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Palombo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Niino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?