Collins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Dwayne Collins
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2010cv01301
Filed: July 21, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 1 Social Security Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/14/2011. Objections to F&R's due within ten (10) days of service.(Bradley, A)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation of February 25, 2011, In Part signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/28/2011. (Bradley, A)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 16 Stipulation of December 23, 2010, In Part signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/27/2010. (Bradley, A)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/21/2010. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Collins
Represented By: Sengthiene Bosavanh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?