Lupe Nieto Jr. v. Hodge et al
Plaintiff: Lupe Nieto , Jr.
Defendant: Drake Hodge, Clovis Police Department and County of Fresno
Case Number: 1:2010cv01397
Filed: August 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Dismissing Plaintiff's Action for Failure to Keep Court Apprised of His Current Address, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/11/2013. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 1/25/2013. (Hall, S)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 35 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/20/2012. (Marrujo, C)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting in Part Defendant's Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories, Set One and Requests for Production of Documents, Set One and Deeming Matters Admitted 32 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/10/12. (Verduzco, M)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Reclassifying Matter as a Prisoner Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/23/12. (Gonzalez, R)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to United States Marshal for Service of First Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/18/2011. (Jessen, A)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 9 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/23/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Admonishing Plaintiff to Comply with the Order Dismissing the Complaint and Granting Leave to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/06/2010. Amended Complaint due by 11/29/2010. (Flores, E)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/30/10: Amended Complaint due by 10/25/2010. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lupe Nieto Jr. v. Hodge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lupe Nieto , Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drake Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clovis Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?