Myers v. City of Madera et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Myers
Defendant: City of Madera and Madera Police Department
Case Number: 1:2010cv01398
Filed: August 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/2/11. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER VACATING the 8/29/2011 hearing on defendants' Motion to Dismiss, document 47 , and taking it under submission as of said date; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/24/2011. (Rooney, M)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING Request to Amend Scheduling Order (Doc. 48 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/4/2011. (Arellano, S.)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record, and ORDER Directing Clerk to Update Docket and Serve Pro Se Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/21/2011. Filing Deadline: 7/25/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 30 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/8/2011. Second Amended Complaint Due within Twenty-One (21) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER vacating hearing date of May 23, 2011 and taking matter under submission signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/18/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Continuing Mid-Discovery Status Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/21/2011. Matter is reset to 6/30/2011 at 08:30 AM. Counsel may appear telephonicall via a one-line conference call to 661-326-6624. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 12 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/28/2011. Plaintiff has thirty (30) days to file an Amended Complaint consistent with this order. (Jessen, A)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING Hearing Date of February 28, 2011 and Taking Matter Under Submission (re 12 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings), Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/23/2011. (Arellano, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. City of Madera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Myers
Represented By: Steven A. Geringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Madera
Represented By: Shelline K. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madera Police Department
Represented By: Shelline K. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?