Orozco v. Harrington
Petitioner: Valdo C. Orozco
Respondent: Kelly Harrington
Case Number: 1:2010cv01599
Filed: September 2, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 40 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/17/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING 20 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and DECLINING TO ISSUE CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/31/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING 32 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/14/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 18 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 09/27/2011. Amended Complaint due by 10/31/2011. (Flores, E)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING 9 Motion For Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/13/2010. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orozco v. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Valdo C. Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kelly Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?