Bradley v. Villa et al
Plaintiff: William Bradley
Defendant: J. Villa, J. Hightower, S. Henderson and Wood
Case Number: 1:2010cv01618
Filed: September 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION that Defendant's 62 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT be Granted and this Action be Dismissed for Failure to Exhaust Available Administrative Remedies, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/2/15. Referred to Judge O'Neill; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Adopting 48 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER for this Action to Proceed Ony Against Defendant C/O L. Villa for Use of Excessive Force in Violation of the Eighth Amendment, and Dismissing all Other Claims and Defendants; Thirty Day Deadline for Defendant Villa to File Answer, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/31/14. Wood (Capt. ), S. Henderson (Lt. 1) and J. Hightower (Sgt. ) terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That This Action Proceed Only Against Defendant Villa for Use of Excessive Force in Violation of the Eighth Amendment, and That all Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/25/14: Objections, if any, due in 20 days. (Hellings, J)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That: (1) Defendants' Unenumerated Rule 12(b) Motion be Denied on Procedural Grounds, Without Prejudice, and (2) Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim be Granted in Part, With Leave to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/17/2014, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER VACATING 41 Findings and Recommendations Entered on March 4, 2014; ORDER DISREGARDING 42 Plaintiff's Response to the Findings and Recommendations as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/11/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Be Denied, and That Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Be Granted In Part, With Leave to Amend 29 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/3/14: Objections, if any, due within thirty days.(Hellings, J)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default 30 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/1/13. (Hellings, J)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion 22 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/22/13. 30-Day Deadline in Which to Return Service Documents to Court. (Verduzco, M)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/8/2011 directing Clerk to file 13 Lodged Second Amended Complaint. (Lundstrom, T)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's request for access to the law library be DENIED; re 7 MOTION for Library Access filed by William Bradley ; referred to Judge O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/07/2010. Objections to F&R due by 11/12/2010 (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Villa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?