Vega v. Chokatos et al
Plaintiff: Angel Louis Vega
Defendant: Jhon Chokatos and Greene
Case Number: 1:2010cv01625
Filed: September 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying 18 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/11/12. (Verduzco, M)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING Action, with prejudice, for failure to state a claim; ORDER that DISMISSAL is subject to 28 USC 1915(G), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 01/01/2012. (Strike); CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Re Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification 9 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/22/11. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vega v. Chokatos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Louis Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jhon Chokatos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?