United States of America v. Approximately $256,533.57 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $256,533.57 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 1:2010cv01630
Filed: September 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 8 U.S.C. ยง 287
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER to DISMISS and CLOSE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/7/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON CLAIMANT ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 31, 2011. 22 MOTION to DISMISS currently set for 2/16/2011 has been CONTINUED to 3/10/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.(Lira, I)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Regarding 21 Motion for Discovery and Inspection of Evidence Filed January 4, 2011 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/10/2011. Mr. Pontillo shall file and serve a verified claim no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, or no later than February 9, 2011. Failure to do so may result in the waiver of any right to claim ownership to the Defendant Currency.(Bradley, A)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Extension of Time to Respond to Forfeiture Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/7/2010. Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc.'s responsive pleading due by 1/6/2011.(Bradley, A)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER For Publication signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/29/2010. (Esteves, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $256,533.57 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Deanna Lynne Martinez, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $256,533.57 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?