Harrington v. Bautista et al
Plaintiff: Garrick Harrington
Defendant: J. Bautista, J. Blaylock, S.L. Rupp, B. Hackworth and L. James
Case Number: 1:2010cv01802
Filed: September 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to Parties' Stipulation re 96 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/25/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER TERMINATING Pending 66 73 Motions for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Settlement Agreement signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/19/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 89 Motion for Reconsideration of Recusal of Assigned Magistrate Judge signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/27/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 87 Motion for Stay of Proceedings and Taking Defendants' Pending Motions Under Submission in Fourteen Days From the Date of Service of This Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/13/16. (Marrujo, C)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' THIRD REQUEST FOR MODIFICATION OF DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/17/2015. (Dispositive Motions filed by 9/23/2015). (Lundstrom, T)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING 69 Defendants' Second Request to Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/28/2015. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/16/2015. (Jessen, A)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 67 Motion to Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/21/15. Dispositive Motions Due By 8/27/2015. (Marrujo, C)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING 60 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the June 2, 2015, Order Denying Request for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/23/2015. (Jessen, A)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING 54 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/1/2015. (Jessen, A)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING 53 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Court's March 24, 2015, Order Denying Appointment of Counsel, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/16/2015. (Jessen, A)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 51 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/24/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING 48 MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA AND/OR ORDER OF PROTECTION signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/23/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Stay and GRANTING Plaintiff Thirty (30) Days to Complete and Return the Necessary Service Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/4/2014. (Jessen, A)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING 21 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/31/2014. Defendants S.L. Rupp, B. Hackworth and L. James terminated. (Jessen, A)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Certain Claims and Defendants be DISMISSED re 20 First Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/6/2014. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 14 Motion for Property signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 5/29/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE: 7 Request for Clarification signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 8/19/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington v. Bautista et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrick Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Blaylock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.L. Rupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Hackworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?