Anaya v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Leticia Anaya
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2010cv01812
Filed: September 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/2/2012 recommending that 1 Social Security Complaint be Denied and that Judgment be entered for Defendant and against Plaintiff. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 2/21/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Regarding 17 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Defendant's Responsive Brief signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/21/2011. (Bradley, A)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to Submit Plaintiff's Confidential Brief signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/16/2011. (Bradley, A)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed IFP 3 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/1/10. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anaya v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Anaya
Represented By: Sengthiene Bosavanh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?