Zone Sports Center, Inc. LLC, et al vs Red Head, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Zone Sports Center Inc. LLC, Fresno Rock Taco, LLC and Milton Peter Barbis
Defendant: Red Head, Inc, Skyy Spirits, LLC, Gruppo Campari, Sammy Hagar and Marco Monroy
Case Number: 1:2010cv01833
Filed: October 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion To Transfer Venue (Doc. # 13 ), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/4/2011. CASE TRANSFERRED to District of Northern District of California, San Francisco Division. (Fahrney, E)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting Request To File Documents Under Seal (Local Rule 141), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/24/2011. (Fahrney, E)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER vacating hearing date of January 24, 2011 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/19/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING 28 Application to File Documents Under Seal signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/18/2011. (Jessen, A)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for a continuance of the hearing on the Motions to Dismiss, documents 13 14 and 17 ; hearing on said motions currently noticed for 1/10/2011 is CONTINUED to 1/24/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; response deadline set for 1/3/2011; reply deadline set for 1/17/2011; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/14/2010. (Rooney, M)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint; and Continuing Scheduling Conference Hearing: Defendants responses due 11/29/2010. Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 12/9/2010 to Monday, January 31, 2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/20/2010. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zone Sports Center, Inc. LLC, et al vs Red Head, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zone Sports Center Inc. LLC
Represented By: Richard Hamlish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fresno Rock Taco, LLC
Represented By: Richard Hamlish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Peter Barbis
Represented By: Richard Hamlish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Head, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyy Spirits, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gruppo Campari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammy Hagar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Monroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?