Swortfiguer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Clifford Alan Swortfiguer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2010cv01835
Filed: October 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Affirming Denial of Benefits and Ordering Judgment for Commissioner, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/21/12. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER for a Second Extension for Defendant to File Notice, Motion and Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/19/2011. (Kusamura, W)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER for a Second Extension for Defendant to File Notice, Motion, and Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment: defendant shall have until 12/28/2011 to file. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/29/2011. (Herman, H)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER for a First Extension for Defendant to File Notice, Motion, and Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment: extension to 11/28/2011. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/28/2011. (Herman, H)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISCHARGING 17 Order to Show Cause, ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request for Extension of Time to File and Opening Brief Until September 27, 2011, Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/30/2011. (Arellano, S.)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/7/2011. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a written response to this Order to ShowCause WITHIN twenty (20) days of the date of this Order.(Bradley, A)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Regarding the Parties' 15 Stipulation filed June 14, 2011 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/15/2011. (Bradley, A)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/05/2010. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swortfiguer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Alan Swortfiguer
Represented By: Bess M. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?