De-Luis-Conti et al v. Cates et al
Plaintiff: Graham Roger-Lee De-Luis-Conti
Defendant: M. Cates, M.S. Evans, Arnold Schwarzenegger and K. Allison
Case Number: 1:2010cv01852
Filed: October 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/1/2013 re 39 Fifth Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 11/21/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING 42 Plaintiff's Miscellaneous Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/20/2013. (Jessen, A)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 40 Request to Supplement Fifth Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/21/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING 36 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DENYING 35 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/15/2012. (Jessen, A)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/19/2012 recommending that 35 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER be DENIED. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within 14-days. (Lundstrom, T)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 30 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/25/2011. (Marrujo, C)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING 28 Motion for Defendants to be Served by U.S. Marshals signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/9/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 24 , 25 Motion to Amend; Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Due 1/14/2011 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/6/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form)(Sant Agata, S)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying Motion to Reconsider Transfer of Case to Eastern District 22 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/8/2010. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De-Luis-Conti et al v. Cates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graham Roger-Lee De-Luis-Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.S. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?