Thomas v. Aetna, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dorrenda Thomas
Defendant: Aetna, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company and Aetna Health of California Inc
Case Number: 1:2010cv01906
Filed: October 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING CASE, with Prejudice, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/28/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ADOPTING in FULL the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DISMISSING Claim for PAGA Penalities Against Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc.; ORDER DENYING Motion for Remand, 17 , 37 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/30/11. (Hellings, J)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that The claim for PAGA penalties asserted against AHC be DISMISSED; and Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand 17 be DENIED. Matter referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due within fifteen (15) days of service of this recommendation; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/2/2011. (Timken, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Aetna, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorrenda Thomas
Represented By: Mark P. Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie Lynn Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Leslie Lynn Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Health of California Inc
Represented By: Leslie Lynn Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?