Hamilton v. Yates et al
Plaintiff: Paul C. Hamilton
Defendant: J. A. Yates, J. Mattingly, R. Trimble and M. Spearman
Case Number: 1:2010cv01925
Filed: October 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 79 Motion to Proceed IFP on Appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/23/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 68 Motion for Reconsideration re Judgment; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 69 Motion for Reconsideration re Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations and ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 73 Motion to Alter, Amend or in the Alternative, Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/28/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to (1) Deny Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Motion for Summary Judgment 59 ; (2) Grant Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Sur-Reply 62 ; and (3) Grant Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 54 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/27/15: Fourteen (14) Day Objection Deadline. (Hellings, J)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING 53 Findings and Recommendations to Deny Plaintiff's 50 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/25/2014. (Marrujo, C)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Plaintiff's 50 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Fourteen Day Objection Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/16/2014. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 10/6/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Motion to Modify the Pretrial Dispositive Motion Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 08/08/2014. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/22/2014. (Flores, E)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 45 Request for Leave to Depose Plaintiff by Videoconference signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/7/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (ECF No. 37 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/24/2013. (Fahrney, E)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ADOPTING 35 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING Defendants Yates, Mattingly, Trimble, and Spearman's 25 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/10/2013. (Marrujo, C)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting Defendants' 31 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Sur-Reply signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 08/15/2013. (Flores, E)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS for Denial of Defendant Harrington's 25 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/26/2013, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Dismissing Certain Claims signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/09/2012. (Flores, E)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS For Dismissal Of Certain Of Plaintiff's Claims And Defendants (ECF Nos. 21 & 22 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/4/2012. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 10/22/2012.(Fahrney, E)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying 16 Plaintiff's Request for an Entry of Default, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/20/12. (Gonzalez, R)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Adopting 11 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Remand signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/21/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 6 Opposition to Defendants' Notice of Removal be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/16/2012. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 2/3/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Yates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul C. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. A. Yates
Represented By: Jessica R. Devencenzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Mattingly
Represented By: Jessica R. Devencenzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Trimble
Represented By: Jessica R. Devencenzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Spearman
Represented By: Jessica R. Devencenzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?