Coulter v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Terry Coulter
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2010cv01937
Filed: October 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Adopting in Full the Findings and Recommendations 42 Granting Counsel's Motion for Attorney Fees 35 pursuant to 42 USC 406(b), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/25/13. (Verduzco, M)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Counsel's Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/8/2013. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motions to Stay 37 38 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/1/2013. CASE STAYED. (Hall, S)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING in FULL the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access for Justice Action, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d) 33 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/18/13. (Hellings, J)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/19/2012. Referred to Judge Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 10/3/2012. (Hall, S)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time for Defendant to File an Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Attorney Fees 30 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on June 8, 2012. Opposition due on or before July 12, 2012.(Hall, S)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations in Full, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/24/12. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION DIRECTING REMAND, AND DIRECTING ENTRY OF JUDGMENTsigned by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/12/2012. Objections to F&R due by 1/26/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/27/2011. Filing Deadline: 8/5/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/24/2011. Filing Deadline: 4/22/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/15/2010. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coulter v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Coulter
Represented By: Sengthiene Bosavanh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?