Steven C. Emery v. Harris
Plaintiff: Steven C. Emery
Defendant: Michael Harris
Case Number: 1:2010cv01947
Filed: October 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 STIPULATION and ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/10/2014. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/26/2014 that Plaintiff, Steven Emery is no longer needed as a witness in these proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is discharged re 87 . (Lundstrom, T)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE and ORDER for Plaintiff, Steven Emery to be returned to Court on 02/26/2014 for further/continued trial proceedings re 87 Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/25/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER QUASHING IN PART and MODIFYING Plaintiff's Trial Subpoena 145 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/21/14. (Hellings, J)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial and to Shorten Time to Hear Motion for Sanctions 139 , 140 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/20/14. (Hellings, J)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER VACATING January 6, 2014 Order and Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Patrick Demery, CDC #J38293, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/5/14. (Hellings, J)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Jesse Greenshaw, CDC # P-93999, Plaintiff's Witness on February 25, 2014 at 8:30 a.m., Courtroom 6, 7th Floor, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/23/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Discovery 82 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/16/14. (Hellings, J)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/10/14: Motions in Limine Filing 1/10/14; Opposition to Motions in Limine 1/24/14; Trial Submissions 2/7/14; Jury Trial February 25, 2014, 8:30 a.m., Courtroom 6. (Hellings, J)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Inmate Patrick Demery, CDC #J38293, Plaintiff's Witness on February 25, 2014 at 8:30 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/6/14. (Hellings, J)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Shortening Time on Plaintiff's Motion for Limited Discovery,signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/31/2013. (Defendant's Opposition: 1/7/2014, Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2013 at 09:00 AM (Telephonic appearances via CourtCall are authorized and encouraged) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Defendants' Witness List, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/26/13. (Verduzco, M)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re Pretrial Filings, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/25/13. (Verduzco, M)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting Motion to Appoint Counsel 43 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/22/13. Attorney Brooks Michael Beard for Steven C. Emery added.(Verduzco, M)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING 45 Motion for Further Discovery as untimely ; ORDERED that Defense Counsel is to contact the Litigation Coordinator at California Substance Abuse Treatment Facility, Corcoran, CA, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/21/13. (14) Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 31 and Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 25 ; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Admissions as Moot 35 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/10/13. (Verduzco, M)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Regarding Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 25 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/9/13. Referred to Judge O'Neill; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion For Extension Of Time To File Dispositive Motions Doc. 22 , Revised Dispositive Motion Deadline: October 19, 2012, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 7/16/2012. (Fahrney, E)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Compel; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 20 Motion to Strike Defendant's Opposition signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 7/12/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Subpoena of Non-Party, without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 3/19/12. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven C. Emery v. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven C. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?