Richard D. Townsend v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Richard D. Townsend
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2010cv01969
Filed: October 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISMISSING CASE for failure to follow a court order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/8/2011. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/7/2011. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a written response to this Order to Show Cause WITHIN twenty (20) days of the date of this Order.(Bradley, A)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Regarding Status Conference; Amended Scheduling Conference Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/1/2011. (Bradley, A)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING Counsel's 15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record; ORDER REQUIRING Personal Appearance of Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/12/2011. Status Conference set for 8/31/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin.(Bradley, A)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER EXTENDING Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/4/2011. (Bradley, A)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER EXTENDING Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/27/2011. (Bradley, A)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP;IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk issue summons and the United States Marshal serve a copy of the complaint, summons and this order upon the defendant(s)as directed by the plaintiff; All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/19/2010. (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard D. Townsend v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard D. Townsend
Represented By: Denise Bourgeois Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?