Garcia v. Commissioner
Plaintiff: Stephanie Garcia
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2010cv01997
Filed: October 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REMANDING the Action for Further Proceedings and DIRECTING the Clerk to CLOSE the Action signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/23/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING 29 Stipulation to Award Equal Access to Justice Act Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d) and Costs Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1920, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/22/2014. (Hall, S)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Directing the Entry of Judgment in Favor of Defendant Michael J. Astrue, Commissioner of Social Security, and Against Plaintiff Stephanie Garcia, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/17/12. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 16 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to File a Responsive Brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/13/2011. Responsive Brief due by 8/11/2011. (Jessen, A)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/8/2011. Filing Deadline: 6/10/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/25/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Garcia
Represented By: Lawrence David Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?