Luna v. California Health Care Services et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Luna
Defendant: California Health Care Services, California Substance Abuse Treatment Facility, Delano and G. Ugwueze
Case Number: 1:2010cv02076
Filed: November 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that (1) Plaintiff's Request for Appointment of Counsel be Denied, and (2) Defendant's 39 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted; Objections Due in Fourteen Days signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/29/2014. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 9/15/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (ECF No. 45 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/27/2014. (Fahrney, E)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Notice and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 01/10/2014. Opposition due by 2/6/2014. (Flores, E)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 41 Request for Leave to File Plaintiff's Medical Records Under Seal For In Camera Review, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/12/2013. (Marrujo, C)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting Defendant's 36 Request to Conduct Plaintiff's Deposition Via Videoconference signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 03/12/2013. (Flores, E)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS For Dismissal Of Certain Claims And Defendants (ECF No. 20 ), Case To Remain Open, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/18/2012. (Fahrney, E)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS for Dismissal of Certain 18 Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 08/09/2012. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 8/27/2012. (Flores, E)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Finding Second Amended Complaint to State a Cognizable Eighth Amendment Claim Against Defendant Ugwueze signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 08/08/2012. (Flores, E)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/12/2010. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna v. California Health Care Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Substance Abuse Treatment Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Ugwueze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?