Garcia v. Mix et al
Plaintiff: Guillermo Garcia
Defendant: M. Mix, E McCue and G. Saylor
Case Number: 1:2010cv02097
Filed: November 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment (ECF No. 90 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/23/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Fahrney, E)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum 110 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/14/15. (Hellings, J)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 85 Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/27/2014. (Flores, E)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Denying 58 Request to Appoint Counsel; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request for Injunctive Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/24/2013. (Flores, E)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion To Take Plaintiff's Deposition By Remote Means (ECF No. 52 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/2/2013. (Fahrney, E)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Disregarding Notice of Submission of Documents (Doc. #43), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/13/12. (Verduzco, M)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER VACATING ORDER 40 Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate and Requiring Defenants to File a Responsive Pleading within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/5/12.Defendants' Answer -(30) Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims, With Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim 38 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/29/12: Matter to proceed on Plaintiff's second amended complaint, filed October 24, 2012, against Defendants Saylor and McCue for denial of access to the court; Plaintiff's other claims are dismissed, with prejudice, for failure to state a claim. (Hellings, J)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for a Court Order 27 THIRTY-DAY DEADLINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/27/12. (Hellings, J)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Remand 14 , 15 ; ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Request for Relief From Responding to the Complaint, and for a Thirty-Day Day Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint, to Commence Upon Issuance of Screening Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/3/11. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Mix et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Mix
Represented By: Diana Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E McCue
Represented By: Diana Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Saylor
Represented By: Diana Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?