Trejo et al v. City of Shafter et al
Plaintiff: Jose Trejo, Juan Trejo, Dora Lopez and Josh Quintero
Defendant: City of Shafter, Matt Shelton and Jeff Priest
Case Number: 1:2010cv02119
Filed: November 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/8/2012. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Vacating Prior Order 32 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/10/12. (Gonzalez, R)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Regarding Notice of Settlement, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/9/12. 21-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER WITHOUT PREJUDICE signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/8/2011. Discovery deadlines: Non-expert 2/10/2012, Joint expert disclosure 2/10/2012, Rebuttal expert disclosure 3/2/2012, Expert 3/23/2012, Non-Dispositive Motion Filing deadline 3/23/2012, hearing by 4/27/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING Application of Juan Trejo to be Appointed Guardian Ad Litem for Minor Josh Quintero (Doc. 8 ), Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/28/2011. (Arellano, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trejo et al v. City of Shafter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Trejo
Represented By: Joel T Andreesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Trejo
Represented By: Joel T Andreesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Lopez
Represented By: Joel T Andreesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Quintero
Represented By: Joel T Andreesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Shafter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Priest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?