Gomez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Benito G. Gomez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2010cv02128
Filed: November 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Stipulation for Dismissal; ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/7/14. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER SETTING plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, document 38 , for hearing on 9/19/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/13/2014. (Rooney, M)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Stay of Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/2/2013. (Martinez, A)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER for REMAND Pursuant to Sentence Six of 42 U.S.C. 405(g), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/2/2011. CASE CLOSED. Defendant shall file a status report every 90 days. (Jessen, A)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/12/2010. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benito G. Gomez
Represented By: Laura Eve Krank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?