Lema v. Modesto
Plaintiff: Geneva Lema
Defendant: City Of Modesto
Case Number: 1:2010cv02180
Filed: November 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Closing Case in Light of Stipulation for Dismissal 42 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/9/12. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Denying Defendant's 39 Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time Within Which to Hear Defendant's Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/6/2012. (Bradley, A)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Regarding Defendant's Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and an Order Deeming Defendant's Requests for Admissions Admitted re 22 - 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/8/2012. (Bradley, A)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Adopting With Modification Stipulation to Amend the Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/3/2012. (Bradley, A)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER Authorizing Limited Disclosure of Confidential City of Modesto Blueprints/Schematics signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/31/2012. (Bradley, A)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Setting Matter for Telephonic Status Conference; ORDER Advising Parties Regarding This Court's Procedure for Disposition of Discovery Motions, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/5/2012. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/23/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin.(Bradley, A)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT the Parties' 16 Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/19/2011. The parties shall appear by telephone as previously ordered, and will be prepared to set all dates and deadlines as required by this Court.(Bradley, A)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/16/2011. Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 6/20/2011 is CONTINUED to 7/20/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. The parties are advised that further stipulations to continue the scheduling conference will not be entertained, or granted, by this Court. (Bradley, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lema v. Modesto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva Lema
Represented By: Timothy S. Thimesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Modesto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?