Williams v. Lane
Petitioner: Eric Lavelle Williams
Respondent: A. Lane
Case Number: 1:2010cv02212
Filed: November 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING CASE for Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Pay Filing Fee; Clerk shall CLOSE the CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/21/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Case Should not be Dismissed for Failure to Comply with Court Order; Plaintiff Must File Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay $350.00 Filing Fee by February 28, 2011, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/07/2011. (Flores, E)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER To Submit Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis Not Later Than January 31, 2011, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/6/2011. (Motion for IFP due by 1/31/2011) (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application)(Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Lavelle Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?