Cortinas v. Lockwood et al
Plaintiff: Larry William Cortinas
Defendant: Timothy Lockwood, Scott Kern, James Yates, Nash, Walker, Herrera, Greene, W. K. Myers, Ward and Arrendono
Case Number: 1:2010cv02270
Filed: December 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK of the Court to Close this Case pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/16/2015. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Adopting 40 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION and GRANTING 34 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment; ORDER DIRECTING Defendant Mora to File an Answer to the First Amended Complaint signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/23/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Regarding Defenant Mora's 34 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/16/15. Referred to Judge O'Neill; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 30 Motion for Default Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/22/2013, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING 27 Motion for Summary Judgment (CONSTRUED as a Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment against Defendant Mora); ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of the Court to enter Default Against Defendant Mora, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/8/12. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE within Thirty Days Why Defendant Mora should not be Dismissed for Failure to Provide Information Sufficient to Effect Service signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/9/2012. Show Cause Response due by 2/13/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Adopting 14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants; ORDER DISREGARDING 19 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/6/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action proceed against: Defendant Mora; Plaintiff's claims against: Defendants Lockwood, Kernan, Yates, Nash, Walker, Herrera, J. Walker, W. Myers, Phillips, Artis, Foston, Catlett, Mardian, Ro hrdanz, Brown, Dudarewicz, Duenas and Igbinosa be DISMISSED from this action for failure to state a claim; re 11 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Larry William Cortinas ; referred to Judge O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/08/2011. Objections to F&R - (30) Day Deadline.(Martin-Gill, S)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING 7 Motion ; ORDER ADOPTING 9 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/5/11. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 7 Plaintiff's Motion, Construed as a Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, filed January 4, 2011, Should be DENIED re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/3/2011. Referred to Judge Wanger. Objections to F&R due within eighteen (18) days. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortinas v. Lockwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry William Cortinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. K. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrendono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?