Chavarria v. Green et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Chavarria
Defendant: Green, Wilson, Dr. Duenas and Dr. Igbinosa
Case Number: 1:2010cv02324
Filed: December 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING 48 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/8/2016. (Jessen, A)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to 1 Dismiss Case, with Prejudice, for Failure to Obey Court Order and Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 01/21/2015. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 2/16/2016.(Flores, E)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff To File Opposition Or Statement Of Non-Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment Within Thirty Days (ECF No. 41 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/28/2015.(Fahrney, E)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Doc. 31 ),ORDER Granting In Part And Denying In Part Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss (Doc. 24 ), ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's Claims For Damages Against Defendants In Their Official Capacities From This Action, ORDER Requiring Defendants To File Answer Within Thirty Days, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/19/2015. (Fahrney, E)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) 24 Motion to Dismiss be Granted in Part and Denied in Part; Objections, if any, Due within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/10/2015. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 3/16/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER VACATING 27 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS of October 30, 2014 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/1/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Case for Failure to Obey Court Order 26 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/29/14. Objections if Any, Due in Twenty Days. Referred to Judge O'Neill. (Gonzalez, R)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/8/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice, based on Plaintiff's failure to obey the Court's order of January 22, 2014; re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Anthony Chavarria ; referred to Judge O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/10/2014. Objections to F&R due by 4/14/2014 (Martin-Gill, S)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING 12 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER for this Action to Proceed Only Against Defendants Duenas, Green, and Wilson, on Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment Medical Claims and ORDER Dismissing All Other Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/16/2014. Defendant Igbinosa terminated. (Jessen, A)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That This Action Proceed Only Against Defendants Duenas, Green, And Wilson, On Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment Medical Claims, And That All Other Claims And Defendants Be Dismissed, Objections, If Any, Due In 30 Days (Doc. 1 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/4/2013. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 1/9/2014.(Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavarria v. Green et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Chavarria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Duenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Igbinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?